NY S06948 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an office of the state medical indemnity fund ombudsman and a medical indemnity fund advisory panel to advocate for, assist and represent the interests of qualified plaintiffs.
Title
Establishes an office of the state medical indemnity fund ombudsman and a medical indemnity fund advisory panel to advocate for, assist and represent the interests of qualified plaintiffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2053 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6948A |
2018-05-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-11-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09018 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - reported referred to ways and means