NY A09018 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an office of the state medical indemnity fund ombudsman and a medical indemnity fund advisory panel to advocate for, assist and represent the interests of qualified plaintiffs.
Title
Establishes an office of the state medical indemnity fund ombudsman and a medical indemnity fund advisory panel to advocate for, assist and represent the interests of qualified plaintiffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-11 | Assembly | print number 9018a |
2018-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06948 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - referred to ways and means