NY S06932 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting bus routes from stopping in front of the residence of a registered sex offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting bus routes from stopping in front of the residence of a registered sex offender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to education
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1667
2018-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2017-10-27SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10247 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback