NY S06916 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9643
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the revised rule public comment period from thirty days to forty-five days.
Title
Relates to increasing the revised rule public comment period from thirty days to forty-five days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9643 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1944 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-10-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09643 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.408