NY A09643 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing the revised rule public comment period from thirty days to forty-five days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing the revised rule public comment period from thirty days to forty-five days.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.408
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1944
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6916
2018-05-22SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2018-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-10Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.881
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-01-30Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06916 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9643

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback