NY S06915 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that dependents of military servicemembers who are transferred out of the state shall remain eligible for certain developmental disability services received under federal home and community based services programs.
Title
Provides that dependents of military servicemembers who are transferred out of the state shall remain eligible for certain developmental disability services received under federal home and community based services programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.17 |
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.488 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.529 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10461a |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6915B |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1504 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6915A |
2016-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A10461 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6915b