NY S06887 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - SIGNED CHAP.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - SIGNED CHAP.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners; extends the provisions thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.39 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.515 |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | substituted for a9450 |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.422 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09450 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - substituted by s6887