NY S06882 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires coursework in the area of diversity, equity and inclusion as part of continuing education requirements for the profession of psychology.
Title
Requires coursework in the area of diversity, equity and inclusion as part of continuing education requirements for the profession of psychology.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08376 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education