NY S06876 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Warren county to become a member of the capital district transportation district by action of their governing body.
Title
Permits Warren county to become a member of the capital district transportation district by action of their governing body.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7015 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1400 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07015 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - signed chap.411