NY S06871 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Salem, in the county of Washington, to extend the Salem fire protection district into the village of Salem.
Title
Authorizes the town of Salem, in the county of Washington, to extend the Salem fire protection district into the village of Salem.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.418 |
2012-08-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9865 |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1120 |
2012-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09865 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6871