NY S06861 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Title
Provides for the automatic enrollment of employees of the city of New York eligible to join the New York city board of education retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7156 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1399 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07156 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - signed chap.721