NY S06850 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6850C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6850C
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a smart phone antitheft protection; establishes requirements for the acquisition and resale of wireless communications devices.
Title
Relates to a smart phone antitheft protection; establishes requirements for the acquisition and resale of wireless communications devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6850C |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6850B |
2014-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6850A |
2014-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08984 (Same As) 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.840