NY S06843 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes lease between the county of Onondaga and Syracuse University for Onondaga Lake Park for park and recreational improvements.
Title
Authorizes lease between the county of Onondaga and Syracuse University for Onondaga Lake Park for park and recreational improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.322 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.663 |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a9760a |
2012-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2012-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6843A |
2012-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09760 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - substituted by s6843a