NY S06834 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to mandatory continuing education for land surveyors.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to mandatory continuing education for land surveyors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9103 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.439 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09103 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - signed chap.61