NY S06802 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to study and report upon the provision of long term care insurance coverage in this state.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to study and report upon the provision of long term care insurance coverage in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Carl Marcellino [R] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.281 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.480 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10711 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1286 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10711 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6802