NY S06786 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to bond anticipation notes issued by the town of Campbell, county of Steuben, validating such notes, and authorizing the issuance of obligations of such with respect thereto.
Title
Makes certain findings and determinations with respect to bond anticipation notes issued by the town of Campbell, county of Steuben, validating such notes, and authorizing the issuance of obligations of such with respect thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.306 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9092 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1119 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09092 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6786