NY S06765 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person with a federal basic permit to apply to the liquor authority for a brand owner's license; establishes a fee therefor.
Title
Allows a person with a federal basic permit to apply to the liquor authority for a brand owner's license; establishes a fee therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.709 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.976 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09107 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - referred to economic development