NY S06758 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Copenhagen Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Title
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Copenhagen Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.380 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.732 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7781a |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6758A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1503 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07781 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6758a