NY S06751 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.397
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that abatement benefits shall not be granted until the applicant files the final application; provides further that if the final application is not filed within one year, benefits shall not be granted until such application is filed at the department's discretion.
Title
Provides that abatement benefits shall not be granted until the applicant files the final application; provides further that if the final application is not filed within one year, benefits shall not be granted until such application is filed at the department's discretion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.397 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.531 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a3766b |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2102 |
2017-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03766 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s6751