NY S06734 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disclosure of arrest and prosecution records of applicants for employment as police officers or peace officers; authorizes the disclosure of arrest and prosecution records to prospective employers of police officer and peace officer applicants provided that every person who is an applicant for the position of police officer or peace officer shall be furnished with a copy of all records and afforded an opportunity to make an explanation thereto.
Title
Relates to disclosure of arrest and prosecution records of applicants for employment as police officers or peace officers; authorizes the disclosure of arrest and prosecution records to prospective employers of police officer and peace officer applicants provided that every person who is an applicant for the position of police officer or peace officer shall be furnished with a copy of all records and afforded an opportunity to make an explanation thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2097 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08324 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes