NY S06726 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of Kendra's law from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2022.
Title
Extends the expiration of Kendra's law from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7688 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2095 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07688 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - signed chap.67