NY S06693 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6693A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6693A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each agency to develop and implement a five-year accessibility plan, to include: the steps the agency is taking and will be taking over the next 5 years to ensure accessibility to the agency's facilities, services, and programs for persons with disabilities, and information on ongoing projects and projects planned over the next 5 years related to improving physical, digital and programmatic access, and effective communications for persons with disabilities.
Title
Requires each agency to develop and implement a five-year accessibility plan, to include: the steps the agency is taking and will be taking over the next 5 years to ensure accessibility to the agency's facilities, services, and programs for persons with disabilities, and information on ongoing projects and projects planned over the next 5 years related to improving physical, digital and programmatic access, and effective communications for persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6693A |
2024-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06116 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - print number 6116a