NY S06683 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a city wholly within the county of Orange to opt out of a county law permitting the sale and possession of sparklers.
Title
Permits a city wholly within the county of Orange to opt out of a county law permitting the sale and possession of sparklers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9455 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1453 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09455 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.458