NY A09455 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a city wholly within the county of Orange to opt out of a county law permitting the sale and possession of sparklers.
Title
Permits a city wholly within the county of Orange to opt out of a county law permitting the sale and possession of sparklers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.458 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1453 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6683 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.702 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06683 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9455