NY S06671 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7071A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7071A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Olean to impose a hotel and motel tax not exceeding five percent of the per diem rental rate for each room.
Title
Authorizes the city of Olean to impose a hotel and motel tax not exceeding five percent of the per diem rental rate for each room.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7071A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1409 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6671A |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.969 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07071 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY