NY S06668 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting businesses located in New York state; requires the creation of the Buy New York Online Networking Directory to connect purchasers with businesses located in New York.
Title
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting businesses located in New York state; requires the creation of the Buy New York Online Networking Directory to connect purchasers with businesses located in New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2016-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.419 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09444 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - referred to economic development