NY S06651 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Title
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.439 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1066 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |