NY S06620 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the tax on combative sport event ticket sales to three percent.
Title
Reduces the tax on combative sport event ticket sales to three percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Budget And Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05254 (Same As) 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken