NY S06610 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6610A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 6610A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective Betsy Horner-Miller Cutrone Memorial Bridge".
Title
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective Betsy Horner-Miller Cutrone Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6610A |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08215 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION