NY S06606 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends expiration of authority granted to the department of housing preservation and development of the city of New York to restructure rents of dwelling units in buildings foreclosed upon by the federal government.
Title
Extends expiration of authority granted to the department of housing preservation and development of the city of New York to restructure rents of dwelling units in buildings foreclosed upon by the federal government.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.178 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.500 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7669 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1096 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07669 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6606