NY S06601 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - SIGNED CHAP.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - SIGNED CHAP.103
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that when a person is under arrest or otherwise in custody of a police officer, peace officer or other law enforcement representative or entity, such officer, representative or entity shall have a duty to provide attention to the medical and mental health needs of such person.
Title
Provides that when a person is under arrest or otherwise in custody of a police officer, peace officer or other law enforcement representative or entity, such officer, representative or entity shall have a duty to provide attention to the medical and mental health needs of such person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.103 |
2020-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.63 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a8226b |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.691 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6601B |
2020-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-10-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6601A |
2019-10-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08226 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - SIGNED CHAP.103