NY S06586 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6586A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6586A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Title
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6586A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06731 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE