NY A06731 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Title
Enacts "Shannon's law"; relates to requiring insurance companies to cover annual mammograms for breast cancer screening for covered persons aged thirty-five and older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6731c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.469 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.646 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.646 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 6731b |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | print number 6731a |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06586 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6586A