NY S06573 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Title
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1393 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6573A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08269 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - print number 8269a