NY A08269 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - print number 8269a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - print number 8269a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Title
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Assembly | print number 8269a |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06573 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES