NY S06545 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.267
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Alienates certain parklands in the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alienates certain parklands in the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.267
2017-08-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.660
2017-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a8231a
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to local governments
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1924
2017-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 6545A
2017-06-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-01SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A08231 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6545a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback