NY A08231 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6545a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6545a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk.
Title
Alienates certain parklands in the town of Smithtown, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6545a |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.660 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | print number 8231a |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06545 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.267