NY S06541 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits vessels from operating, anchoring or mooring in the navigable waters of the state while operating a digital billboard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits vessels from operating, anchoring or mooring in the navigable waters of the state while operating a digital billboard.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.532
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8290b
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1739
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6541A
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08290 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6541a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback