NY A08290 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.175
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.175
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits vessels from operating, anchoring or mooring in the navigable waters of the state while operating a digital billboard.
Title
Prohibits vessels from operating, anchoring or mooring in the navigable waters of the state while operating a digital billboard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.175 |
2019-08-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.532 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8290b |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1739 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6541A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6541a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.532 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.532 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8290b |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | print number 8290a |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S06083 (Same As) 2020-01-15 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06541 (Same As) 2019-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.175
S06541 (Same As) 2019-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.175