NY S06531 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9056
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the consumption of alcohol by students under the age of twenty-one who are enrolled in certain courses of study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the consumption of alcohol by students under the age of twenty-one who are enrolled in certain courses of study.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-15SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9056
2016-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-05-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-05-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.879
2016-01-22SenateREFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE

Same As/Similar To

A09056 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback