NY S06526 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6526A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 6526A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sets the increase to the overtime ceiling as a fixed percentage.
Title
Sets the increase to the overtime ceiling as a fixed percentage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6526A |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07309 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - print number 7309a