NY S06501 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the LGBTQ+ advisory board to make recommendations, conduct research, and more regarding the LGBTQ+ community in New York state.
Title
Establishes the LGBTQ+ advisory board to make recommendations, conduct research, and more regarding the LGBTQ+ community in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.77 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.621 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9648a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6501B |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1219 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6501A |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09648 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6501b