NY S06496 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6496A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6496A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to exemption from taxation of alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions relating to exemption from taxation of alterations and improvements to multiple dwellings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6496A |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1729 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08402 (Same As) 2020-03-24 - print number 8402a