NY S06486 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7389C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a moratorium on cryptocurrency mining operations that use proof-of-work authentication methods to validate blockchain transactions; provides that such operations shall be subject to a full generic environmental impact statement review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a moratorium on cryptocurrency mining operations that use proof-of-work authentication methods to validate blockchain transactions; provides that such operations shall be subject to a full generic environmental impact statement review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-02SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7389C
2022-06-02SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1923
2022-06-02SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2022-06-02SenateREFERENCE CHANGED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2022-03-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 6486D
2022-03-21SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 6486C
2022-01-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-06-08Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2021-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1564
2021-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 6486B
2021-06-05SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2021-05-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 6486A
2021-05-25SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2021-05-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07389 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S6486
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06486&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06486
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06486&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06486A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06486&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06486B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06486&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06486C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06486&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06486D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S6486#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S6486#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S6486#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S6486#SC2

Bill Comments

feedback