NY A07389 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a moratorium on cryptocurrency mining operations that use proof-of-work authentication methods to validate blockchain transactions; provides that such operations shall be subject to a full generic environmental impact statement review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a moratorium on cryptocurrency mining operations that use proof-of-work authentication methods to validate blockchain transactions; provides that such operations shall be subject to a full generic environmental impact statement review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-02SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-06-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-06-02Senate3RD READING CAL.1923
2022-06-02SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6486D
2022-04-26SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2022-04-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-04-26Assemblypassed assembly
2022-04-25Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.84
2022-04-25Assemblyrules report cal.84
2022-04-25Assemblyreported
2022-04-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2022-03-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2022-03-18Assemblyprint number 7389c
2022-03-18Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2021-10-22Assemblyprint number 7389b
2021-10-22Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2021-06-04Assemblyprint number 7389a
2021-06-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2021-05-20Assemblyreference changed to environmental conservation
2021-05-06Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S06486 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7389C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7389
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07389
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07389A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07389B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07389C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07389&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A7389#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback