NY S06479 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.353
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.353
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making all single-occupancy bathrooms gender neutral in school districts, charter schools, SUNY, CUNY, community colleges, restaurants, bars, mercantile establishments, factories and state owned or operated buildings.
Title
Relates to making all single-occupancy bathrooms gender neutral in school districts, charter schools, SUNY, CUNY, community colleges, restaurants, bars, mercantile establishments, factories and state owned or operated buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.353 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.796 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6479A |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-12 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.473 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | reported |
2020-03-05 | Senate | print number 5240a |
2020-03-05 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5240A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.796 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6479A |
2020-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05240 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.353