NY S06475 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation and office of temporary and disability assistance to establish programs to encourage the removal and replacement of single-wall steel home heating oil storage tanks which are leaking or otherwise pose a threat to the environment.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation and office of temporary and disability assistance to establish programs to encourage the removal and replacement of single-wall steel home heating oil storage tanks which are leaking or otherwise pose a threat to the environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1791 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6475A |
2018-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |