NY S06469 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that, for purposes of the unemployment insurance law, the entity which pays an individual shall be the employer even if the work or services are performed for a different entity.
Title
Provides that, for purposes of the unemployment insurance law, the entity which pays an individual shall be the employer even if the work or services are performed for a different entity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.701 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1724 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6469 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.219 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.219 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8035 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1724 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08035 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.701