NY S06465 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to collection period after assessment not being extended as a result of hospitalization for members of the armed forces, astronauts and victims of certain terrorist attacks.
Title
Relates to collection period after assessment not being extended as a result of hospitalization for members of the armed forces, astronauts and victims of certain terrorist attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9191 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A09191 (Same As) 2016-11-04 - signed chap.411