NY A09191 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to collection period after assessment not being extended as a result of hospitalization for members of the armed forces, astronauts and victims of certain terrorist attacks.
Title
Relates to collection period after assessment not being extended as a result of hospitalization for members of the armed forces, astronauts and victims of certain terrorist attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.411 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.244 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6465 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.552 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06465 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9191